ARTSCAPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an arts based charity that works to improve the lives, well-being and health of those that face isolation through poor health and circumstance. Our Aims are to provide a safe welcoming environment where participants are given the opportunity to explore their own creativity through music, singing and a wide range of media including printmaking, sculpture, pastels, paint...
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,166 from 1 government contract(s) and £332 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
- ARTSCAPE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Piper | Chair | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Denise Anne Walsh | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ayton | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Selena Carr | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Patrick Barry | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CLAXTON BA, B ED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.53k | £36.20k | £31.12k | £27.13k | £22.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.93k | £19.63k | £32.41k | £30.95k | £27.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.09k | £3.08k | £2.38k | £332 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 19 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 APR 2018 as amended on 13 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
The promotion of good health, both mental and physical, for the public benefit among people who face isolation or social constraint through poor health, social circumstance, and/or as a result of recovery from substance abuse.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Petersfield Town Council
24 Heath Road
PETERSFIELD
Hampshire
GU31 4EA
- Phone:
- 07452955626
- Email:
- artscapecontact@gmail.com
- Website:
-
artscapeartproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window