THE HOWARD PARTNERSHIP ADVISORY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the benefit of the public, in particular but without limitation to advance the education of the pupils at any Partnership School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
- 27 November 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE HOWARD PARTNERSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 04 April 2014 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 29 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY RELEVANT SCHOOL, OR AT ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS OR HAS ACTED AS A FOUNDATION, IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY MUST (WHERE APPLICABLE) HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS; AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL WITH WHOM ANY RELEVANT SCHOOL WORKS IN PARTNERSHIP OR COLLABORATION WHETHER FORMALLY OR NOT; AND 3.2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY. "RELEVANT SCHOOL" IS DEFINED AS A SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS AS A FOUNDATION FOR THE PURPOSES OF SECTION 21(1)(A) OF THE SCHOOL STANDARDS AND FRAMEWORK ACT 1998.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window