AUDLEY PLAYERS' THEATRE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an amateur dramatic society and own, operate and administer a small theatre, The Audley Theatre, for the presentation of plays, shows and concerts. We also make our facilities available to other societies and groups with similar interests. We also have an active youth section and aim to stimulate and encourage their interest in the stage and the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 February 1972: Standard registration
- 21 April 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 April 2018: Funds transferred to 1174049 THE AUDLEY PLAYERS' THEATRE CLUB
- AUDLEY THEATRE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.30k | £27.61k | £28.47k | £28.73k | £27.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.76k | £19.92k | £29.64k | £21.35k | £22.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 25 May 2017 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2016
(These accounts |
25 May 2017 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 15 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2014
(These accounts |
15 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE AUDLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window