Accounts and annual returns NORTH LONDON MIKVAH LIMITED

Charity number: 1139338
Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 December 2022 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 May 2022 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required