Financial history TRUSTCHILDREN SUPPORT GROUP UK

Charity number: 1139559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.13k £25.43k £30.63k £17.63k £36.33k
Total expenditure £20.79k £23.72k £21.78k £20.72k £32.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A