TRUSTCHILDREN SUPPORT GROUP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and hardship among needy, poor and orphaned children in India through the provision of shelter and nutrition, health, education, general welfare and vocational training programmes, and in particular to support the work of TRUST (Thirumaran Rural Upliftment Stable Trust) and the TRUST Children Home in rural Vengadampatty, Tamil Nadu, South India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 29 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Finn James | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emily Claire D'Silva | Trustee | 13 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Arliss James | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE EDITH LEONORA Hooper | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN D'SILVA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.13k | £25.43k | £30.63k | £17.63k | £36.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.79k | £23.72k | £21.78k | £20.72k | £32.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 31 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 08 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG NEEDY, POOR, AND ORPHANED CHILDREN IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SHELTER AND NUTRITIONAL, HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL, GENERAL WELFARE AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING PROGRAMMES. (B) IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF T.R.U.S.T. (THIRUMARAN UPLIFTMENT STABLE TRUST) AND THE TRUST CHILDREN'S HOME.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 NORTH STREET
WINTERBORNE STICKLAND
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 0NJ
- Phone:
- 01258880118
- Email:
- richard@TRUSTchildren.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window