THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SEBASTIAN, WOKINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Sebastian's Church mission statement states that 'we believe God is calling us as a church to be a beacon in the community, to lead people to Jesus Christ and to help them grow in Him. ?A city set on a hill cannot be hidden? (Matthew 5:14)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £475 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 January 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST SEBASTIAN'S PCC, WOKINGHAM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rickey Simpson-Gray | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel James Wickens | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Donald Mackenzie | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Metson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Bull | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lorraine Wickens | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Morrison | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Murray Foulds | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Beatrice Unwin | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Smart | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Birch | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD CONGRAM | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suman Raj Shrestha | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET FRANCES ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.54k | £166.24k | £144.84k | £147.73k | £176.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.74k | £162.74k | £176.37k | £172.42k | £175.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £475 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Sebastians Parish Centre
Nine Mile Ride
WOKINGHAM
RG40 3AT
- Phone:
- 01344761050
- Email:
- office@stsebastians.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window