THE PHILOSOPHY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to bring philosophy to the wider community and particularly into challenging schools to develop childrenÔÇÖs autonomous learning and higher-order thinking skills, equipping them for life-long learning and creative and critical thinking essential in the 21st Century. We also want to engage the general public in philosophy and its uses for every day living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Portsmouth City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jayne Atkinson | Chair | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tace Heuston | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Micah Mackay | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isaac William Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Edginton | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McArevey | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Barrett Finch | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.63k | £249.06k | £219.78k | £212.38k | £188.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.73k | £218.21k | £217.39k | £241.50k | £246.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £17.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.86k | £16.12k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF PHILOSOPHY AND TO PROMOTE THE SKILLS WHICH DERIVE FROM PHILOSOPHICAL LEARNING AND THE APPLICATION OF PHILOSOPHICAL METHODOLOGY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RO GSM
21-27 Lamb's Conduit Street
London
WC1N 3GS
- Phone:
- 07842410992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window