DSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
D:SIDE IS A COMPREHENSIVE DRUG & ALCOHOL EDUCATION PROGRAMME THAT ENCOURAGES CHILDREN TO MAKE POSITIVE & HEALTHY LIFE-CHOICES WHILST PROMOTING A PRO-ACTIVE ATTITUDE TO LIFE. WE FOCUS ON DEVELOPING THE CHILDREN'S KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS & ATTITUDE, WHILST EQUIPPING THEM WITH THE APPROPRIATE LIFE SKILLS TO SUCCESSFULLY MANAGE SENSITIVE SITUATIONS WITH PEERS & ENCOURAGE A POSITIVE APPROACH TO LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 April 2011: Standard registration
- DSIDE (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Siobhan Leonard | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE CASEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JAN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.77k | £43.84k | £29.61k | £33.17k | £40.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.32k | £41.26k | £35.77k | £32.46k | £39.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE,SCHOOLS,COMPANIES AND PUBLIC BODIES IN THE AREA OF DRUG AND ALCOHOL AWARENESS.THE AREA OF BENEFIT BEING YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER,ESPECIALLY THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF LEEDS. THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASONS OF ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL,IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O UNILEVER
96 COAL ROAD
SEACROFT
LEEDS
WEST YORKSHIRE
LS14 2AR
- Phone:
- 07734706980
- Email:
- davidh@dside.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window