UNIVERSITY OF ESSEX STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taking care of the educational and social aspects of students life at the University of Essex. Working with local and regional groups to promote the excellent volunteering work that students carry out. encouraging health and well being through the coordination of a number of sporting and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£8,767,705
Donations and legacies | £3.28m | |
Charitable activities | £5.43m | |
Other trading activities | £25.62k | |
Investments | £19.61k | |
Other | £6.18k |
Total expenditure:
£8,407,817
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.40m | |
Other | £6.56k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.56k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.40m | |
Retained for future use | £359.89k |
People

300 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
1468 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 08 February 2011: Standard registration
- UOESU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lily-May Eileen Cameron | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simran Kshirsagar | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Adenaike | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abdulaziz Shaikh | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Christopher Davison | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Luca Stuart Gugolz | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Louie Bragg | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yury Karutin | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guilherme Banari | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lau | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Eiden | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Turnbull | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwanifemi Oluwadamilola Wilson-Adu | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph William Holmes | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marium Masroor | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantel Louise Le Carpentier | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74m | £8.29m | £5.08m | £7.86m | £8.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.33m | £7.80m | £4.99m | £8.41m | £8.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £606.52k | £715.08k | £18.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.72m | £3.27m | £3.78m | £3.04m | £3.28m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £34.29k | £27.64k | £11.59k | £20.43k | £25.62k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.95m | £4.97m | £1.19m | £4.74m | £5.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £303 | £146 | £0 | £21 | £19.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £45.16k | £29.41k | £101.41k | £58.89k | £6.18k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.33m | £7.80m | £4.98m | £8.41m | £8.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £868 | £334 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.44k | £36.54k | £38.30k | £46.84k | £54.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £8.17k | £3.33k | £6.56k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £314.96k | £364.91k | £261.57k | £369.21k | £417.20k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.94m | £1.64m | £1.85m | £2.11m | £2.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.05m | -£566.72k | -£539.01k | -£1.01m | -£847.62k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.10m | £835.09k | £879.73k | £1.33m | £1.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT UNIVERSITY OF ESSEX FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT UNIVERSITY OF ESSEX DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 2. BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND UNIVERSITY O ESSEX AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 3. PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF ESSEX STUDENTS'UNION
WIVENHOE PARK
COLCHESTER
CO4 3SQ
- Phone:
- 01206863211
- Email:
- su@essex.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window