Trustees UNIVERSITY OF ESSEX STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1140278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lily-May Eileen Cameron Chair 12 October 2021
None on record
Simran Kshirsagar Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Sarah Adenaike Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Abdulaziz Shaikh Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Alexander Christopher Davison Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Luca Stuart Gugolz Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Benjamin Louie Bragg Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Yury Karutin Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Guilherme Banari Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Ian Lau Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Susannah Eiden Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Charlotte Turnbull Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Oluwanifemi Oluwadamilola Wilson-Adu Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Joseph William Holmes Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Marium Masroor Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Chantel Louise Le Carpentier Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record