MARKET WEIGHTON CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity encourages high standards of architecture and town planning in the township of Market Weighton, stimulates public interest in and care for the beauty, history and character of the town and its surroundings; and encourages the preservation, development and improvement of features of general public amenity or historic interest; through meetings, exhibitions, talks, and other means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 February 1972: Standard registration
- 23 December 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 December 2022: Funds transferred to 1112290 YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER ASSOCIATION OF CIVIC SOCIETIE...
- THE MARKET WEIGHTON CIVIC SOCIETY (Working name)
- MARKET WEIGHTON CIVIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £470 | £250 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £50 | £805 | £50 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 1972 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2018 as amended on 24 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE (A) TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN THE TOWNSHIP OF MARKET WEIGHTON IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE ("THE TOWN"); (B) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS; (C) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST; AND (D) TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND PROMOTIONS OF SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE
Area of benefit
MARKET WEIGHTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window