Financial history EVERY LIFE INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1139406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £272.26k £280.21k £241.83k £391.59k £715.50k
Total expenditure £283.72k £252.44k £265.63k £315.91k £413.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.94k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £715.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £282
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £413.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £42
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £217.25k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0