Financial history MANNA OF GRACE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1139795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.66k £8.64k £8.67k £9.64k £6.34k
Total expenditure £7.05k £8.28k £6.10k £10.23k £6.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A