MANNA OF GRACE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1139795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding Weekly Church Services, Advocacy, Community Support, Counselling, Seminars and Workshops, Leadership Training, Conferences and Youth Activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £6,340
Total expenditure: £6,083

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MOGM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PEARL QUAGRAINE Chair
None on record
EUGENIA DAVIES Trustee
None on record
PATRICK KINZONZI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.66k £8.64k £8.67k £9.64k £6.34k
Total expenditure £7.05k £8.28k £6.10k £10.23k £6.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
130 Christianfields Avenue
Gravesend
DA12 5NW
Phone:
07939389210
Website:

No information available