GO COMMANDO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the families of serving and veteran Royal Marines when the need arises. Our children's nursery project, The Brambles, is the main focus of our fundraising at present and will offer places to the children of serving Royal Marines as well as the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Wayne Blackman | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Winter | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Warner-Blackman | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER BERKS | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LIZ LATHAM | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £6.06k | £6.36k | £2.91k | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £4.57k | £8.52k | £6.53k | £126 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (I) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY THE SUPPORT AND RELIEF OF FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SERVING PERSONNEL OF THE ROYAL MARINES THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) SUPPORTING THE DEPENDANT FAMILIES WHEN ROYAL MARINES ARE DEPLOYED ON OPERATIONS OR EXERCISE. (B) PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES TO AMELIORATE THE MORE DIFFICULT CIRCUMSTANCES THAT ROYAL MARINE’S FAMILIES ENCOUNTER BY VIRTUE OF BEING AWAY FROM THEIR HOMES, OFTEN WITHOUT A PARTNER. (II) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO SERVING AND FORMER SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL MARINES AND THEIR WIDOWS, FAMILIES AND OTHER DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brambles Day Nursery
Pen Elm Hill
Pen Elm
Norton Fitzwarren
TAUNTON
TA2 6PE
- Phone:
- 01823 259903
- Email:
- info@gocommando.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window