UPENDO CHILDREN'S HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upendo provides ethical, sustainable and entrepreneurial support for disadvantaged youngsters in the Mwanza region of Tanzania. We seek to provide the best possible start in life for the kids we support through sponsorship of good education and healthcare. We strive to work with the local community of Mwanza to establish a degree of self-sustainability for Upendo.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tanzania
Governance
- 25 May 2011: Standard registration
- UPENDO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLY TOWNSEND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW RIGBY | Trustee | 29 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES QUAYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £2.27k | £3.46k | £7.10k | £10.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.74k | £2.62k | £3.17k | £7.48k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 01 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF ORPHANS, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CHILDREN'S HOME IN BUSWELU VILLAGE, MWANZA, TANZANIA.
Area of benefit
BUSWELU VILLAGE, MWANZA, TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Malswick Court
35 Tower Mill Road
LONDON
SE15 6FX
- Phone:
- 07815843789
- Email:
- team@upendotanzania.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window