Financial history Red Horse Vale & District Community First Responders

Charity Number: 1140022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.84k £20.45k £1.81k £4.33k £6.24k
Total expenditure £8.14k £4.48k £7.94k £8.39k £9.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A