THE CHEER-UP SQUAD LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND MORAL SUPPORT TO SICK DISABLED AND ELDERLY PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BOTH IN HOSPITAL AND AT HOME AND TO PERSONS IN PRISONS AND TO UPLIFT AND RAISE THEIR SPIRITS AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION IN PARTICULAR BY ARRANGING VISITS TO AND ENTERTAINMENT FOR THE SICK, ELDERLY AND FRAIL, WEEKEND ACTIVITIES AND HOLIDAYS FOR SICK AND ILL PEOPLE TOGETHER WITH PERSONS CARING FOR THEM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
116 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Breuer | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Moses Mandel | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ABRAHAM GLUCK | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.30k | £47.95k | £60.22k | £71.62k | £62.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.23k | £45.86k | £59.01k | £66.83k | £49.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND MORAL SUPPORT TO SICK AND ILL PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BOTH IN HOSPITAL AND AT HOME AND TO PERSONS IN PRISONS AND TO UPLIFT AND RAISE THEIR SPIRITS AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY ARRANGING VISITS TO AND ENTERTAINMENT FOR THE SICK, ELDERLY AND FRAIL, WEEKEND ACTIVITIES AND HOLIDAYS FOR SICK AND ILL PEOPLE TOGETHER WITH PERSONS CARING FOR THEM AND VISITS TO PERSONS IN PRISONS THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 3
107 Dunsmure Road
London
N16 5HT
- Phone:
- 02088000008
- Email:
- admin@thecheerupsquad.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window