CHRIST CHURCH, UXBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 02 December 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Mackin | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|||||
PETER DAVID KING | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise George | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Simpson | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Joanne Mary Mackin BA | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.17k | £227.21k | £248.34k | £248.34k | £216.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.68k | £212.71k | £209.41k | £209.41k | £214.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH
REDFORD WAY
UXBRIDGE
UB8 1SZ
- Phone:
- 01895258956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window