RECLAIM PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RECLAIM is a leadership and social change organisation creating a Britain where working class young people are positively seen, authentically heard and leading meaningful change. We run leadership programmes, support young people's campaigns for change and work with organisations looking to be more inclusive of working class talent. We're based in Manchester but our work reaches across the country
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 January 2011: Standard registration
- RECLAIM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Kay Polley | Chair | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Ann Firth | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Langer | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monica Mwanje | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brown | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £488.67k | £427.17k | £544.28k | £384.96k | £392.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £545.92k | £418.89k | £429.59k | £460.37k | £404.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £186.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £186.54k | £10.00k | £140.93k | £10.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £42.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £501.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £418.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £11.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £102 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 NOVEMBER 2010 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY,INITIALLY OF GREATER MANCHESTER BUT ALSO OF THE UNITED KINGDOM,IN SUCH A WAY AS THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
RECLAIM
Manchester Deaf Centre
Crawford House
Booth Street East
MANCHESTER
M13 9GH
- Phone:
- 07739752348
- Email:
- info@reclaimproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window