CHILD HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 18 February 1978: Standard registration
- CHILDHAVEN TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PAUL MASHINTER | Trustee | 01 September 1993 |
|
|||||
ENID MARY BURSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £1.99k | £2.72k | £2.79k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18k | £750 | £2.71k | £3.22k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 JUNE 1973
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING POOR CHILDREN IN NEED OF CARE AND TEMPORARY REST AND CHANGE OF AIR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THEIR HEALTH WHETHER DURING A PERIOD OF CANVALESCENCE OR OTHERWISE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS OR DONATIONS TO OTHER INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 GARDEN ROAD
BRIGHOUSE
HD6 2DH
- Phone:
- 01484717750
- Email:
- paulmashinter@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window