COMMUNITY OF GAYHURST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are The PTA for a Hackney Primary School. Main objective is to organise fundraising events that raise money for extra curricular activities/resources.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,185
Total expenditure: £22,662

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COGS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Carolyn Nottingham Trustee 12 September 2023
HALF MOON YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Elizabeth Alice Thorne Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.07k £15.38k £4.02k £14.28k £19.18k
Total expenditure £30.62k £16.83k £5.37k £7.51k £22.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2022 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 April 2022 542 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GAYHURST SCHOOL
GAYHURST ROAD
LONDON
E8 3EN
Phone:
02072546138