THE FIREFIGHTERS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN NATIONAL MEMORIALS / MONUMENTS / CHAPELS / REMEBRANCE RECORDS RELATING TO FALLEN FIREFIGHTERS ON A NATIONAL LEVEL. PROMOTE and ATTEND MEMORIAL SERVICES. SUPPORT RESEARCH TO IMPROVE FIREFIGHTER SAFETY. GIVE SUPPORT TO THOSE INJURED IN THE COURSE OF THEIR DUTIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Standard registration
- FMT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN JOHN LIVETT BEM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas John Abbott | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dickson Scott QFSM | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregan Henry Board | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Basson | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Askew | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Davis | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Anne Harper | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Mia Alison Kyte Hilborn | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL BOTTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alan House | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.81k | £26.16k | £25.79k | £24.12k | £24.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.12k | £14.74k | £62.09k | £19.48k | £22.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 March 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2022
(These accounts |
04 March 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 04 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL ALLOW THE TRUSTEES TO HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST UPON TRUST AS TO THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR THE COMMEMORATION OF FIREFIGHTERS KILLED IN THE LINE OF DUTY IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) THE PROVISION OF, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF AND MAINTENANCE OF MEMORIALS INCLUDING STATUES, MEMORIAL GARDENS, BOOKS OF REMEMBRANCE, PLAQUES AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEMORIALS; (B) THE HOLDING OF, OR PARTICIPATION IN, MEMORIAL SERVICES OR OTHER ACTS OF REMEMBRANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 DUKES MEADOW
HAMSTREET
ASHFORD
TN26 2HD
- Phone:
- 01233732348
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window