HACKNEY PARISH ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity Number: 1139580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity is the provision and maintenance of charitable social housing solely through the provision of almshouse accommodation for people in financial need who live in the area of benefit..The trustee may, in exceptional circumstances, appoint a resident who is in financial need and lives outside the area of benefit, or has a family connection to the area of benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £437,033
Total expenditure: £508,734

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DR SPURSTOWE & BISHOP WOOD ALMSHOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
  • HACKNEY PARISH ALMHOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Jarrett Chair 22 April 2015
None on record
Rev Nathan Hayes Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
PENNY WROUT Trustee 15 August 2019
None on record
John Parmiter Trustee 15 March 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY
Received: 181 days late
ROYAL FEMALE SCHOOL OF ART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KINGS CROSS CHURCH
Received: On time
JACQUELINE DIANE DRIVER BSC HONS Trustee 15 March 2018
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Olivia Gordon Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
THE REVEREND ANDREW WILSON Trustee 19 January 2017
SOUTH HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SOUTH HACKNEY PAROCHIAL SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM WITH CHRIST CHURCH, SOUTH HACKNEY
Received: On time
Rev AL GORDON Trustee 26 September 2016
ALPHA INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HAM
Received: On time
Datoru Ben Paul Worika Trustee 28 July 2016
None on record
Councillor Margaret Gordon Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £328.04k £328.56k £496.23k £365.00k £437.03k
Total expenditure £222.80k £222.88k £252.84k £368.90k £508.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 28 OCT 1960 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CHARITABLE SOCIAL HOUSING SOLELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL NEED WHO LIVE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE TRUSTEE MAY, IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES, APPOINT A RESIDENT WHO IS IN FINANCIAL NEED AND LIVES OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR HAS A FAMILY CONNECTION TO THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE TRUSTEE MAY MAKE IT A CONDITION OF PERSON'S BEING APPOINTED AND BEING PERMITTED TO REMAIN A RESIDENT THAT SHE OR HE SHOULD PAY FROM RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO HER OR HIM A WEEKLY CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PROPERTY IN WHICH SHE OR HE RESIDES AND ESSENTIAL SERVICES THEREIN.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY OR WITHIN ONE KILOMETRE THEREOF, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH HACKNEY.
Registration history
  • 04 March 2011 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Trust Partnership Ltd
6 Trull Farm Buildings
Trull
TETBURY
GL8 8SQ
Phone:
01285841900
Website:

No information available