HESWALL HALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION OF HESWALL HALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 February 2011: Standard registration
- 15 June 2016: Funds received from 514741 THE RIVERSIDE PLAYERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Anne Griffith | Chair | 26 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julia Firth | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Lesley Cheatham | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary McCawley | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Franklin Marks | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ann Cannon | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Ellis | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lesley Mather | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.72k | £180.80k | £67.35k | £221.64k | £169.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.38k | £204.00k | £182.43k | £259.25k | £197.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.14k | £40.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 08 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HESWALL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND OTHER DISTRICTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, DISABILITY OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heswall Hall Community Tust
111 Telegraph Road
Heswall
WIRRAL
CH60 0AF
- Phone:
- 0151 342 2614
- Email:
- info@heswallhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window