EMDR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1140865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We advance the theory and practice of Eye Movement Desensitisation and Reprocessing by providing a membership organisation for accreditation, training, regional groups, academic conferences, research, communication with the media and is a constituent member of EMDR Europe. We provide humanitarian assistance through subsidised membership to qualified persons in countries affected by war,disaster.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUSTIN NEIL HAVENS Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
ANDREW RICHARDSON WLIKINSON Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
PHILIP ANDREWS Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
EMMA MULLINS CROCKER Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
Oenone Dudley Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Colleen Swinden Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
HEENA CHUDASAMA WILKINSON Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Russell Hurn Trustee 19 March 2021
None on record
Louise Mackinney Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Alison Russell Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record
KATHLEEN JOSIE NORGATE Trustee 23 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £343.34k £421.53k £510.32k £560.80k £712.73k
Total expenditure £248.97k £254.59k £324.22k £405.30k £579.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £509.36k £526.92k £694.86k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15 £389 £3.81k
Income - Other N/A N/A £950 £33.49k £14.06k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £324.22k £405.30k £579.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £25.01k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A £1.69k £1.63k £1.10k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £723.01k £863.30k £1.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £21.91k £6.65k £41.41k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 13 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 13 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brabners C/O CHARITIES DEPARTMENT
Horton House
Exchange Flags
LIVERPOOL
L2 3YL
Phone:
00000000000