Governing document EMDR ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2014 as amended on 23 Mar 2019 as amended on 26 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1.1 The Objects are: 1.1.1 The relief of sickness. Without prejudice to the generality of the forgoing to advance the theory and practice of Eye Movement Desensitisation and Reprocessing (EMDR); 1.1.2 The relief of poverty and distress wherever it may arise by the provision of humanitarian aid, by supporting other like-minded charities.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.