MOHAMMADI TRUST BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of Trust is to advance the Islamic Religion in Birmingham for the benefit of the Public. The Trust also achieves the objective by establishing Mosques, Prayers and Islamic Education. The Trust also works to prevent or relief of poverty by provision of services, support and advice which the could not otherwise afford through lack of means through fund raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED IBRAHIM | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL HADI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SULEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ASLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GUL BAHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.31k | £121.38k | £276.68k | £212.79k | £152.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.42k | £52.87k | £44.37k | £44.04k | £68.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.58k | £4.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN BIRMINGHAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF ISLAM AND THE BELIEF IN ISLAM LA ILAHA IL-ALLAH MOHAMMED AR RASUL ALLAH AND THE BELIEF THAT THE MAIN SPRINGS OF ISLAMIC TEACHINGS ARE THE "QUR'AN", THE BOOK REVEALED BY ALLAH AND THE "SUNNAH" OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS OF ALLAH BE UPON HIM). B). THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, SUPPORT AND ADVICE WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE CLASSES.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24-36 HARTOPP ROAD
SALTLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B8 1TE
- Phone:
- 01213287773
- Email:
- maqsood.ahmed@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window