HEADCASE CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Headcase Cancer Trust raises money by running and supporting various events throughout the UK. All money raised is used to fund research into the causes and a possible cure for Glio Blastoma Multiforme Brain Tumours which claim the lives of around 6000 UK people annually. Headcase finances PhD researchers at Nottingham and Birmingham Universities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 October 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 January 2011: Standard registration
- HEADCASE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN SPEIRS | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/10/2020 | 19/10/2021 | 19/10/2022 | 19/10/2023 | 19/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.15k | £155.84k | £39.48k | £42.12k | £55.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.89k | £61.94k | £69.24k | £38.75k | £7.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 October 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTDEED 25 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDICAL PROFESSION IN ALL ASPECTS OF GLIOBLASTOMA MULTIFORME (GBM) BRAIN TUMOURS, BY THE COMMISSIONING, PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND EFFECTIVE TREATMENTS OF GBM BRAIN TUMOURS, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 2) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY IMPROVING THE DIAGNOSIS OF GBM BRAIN TUMOURS AND INTRODUCING NEW THERAPEUTIC STRATEGIES, WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING SURVIVAL TIMES, IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PATIENTS AND ULTIMATELY OF FINDING A CURE FOR GBM BRAIN TUMOURS-ÇÖ"
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Newhall Farm Cottages
Middleton Priors
BRIDGNORTH
Shropshire
WV16 6UN
- Phone:
- 01746712065
- Email:
- ANDYJ@HEADCASE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window