BOURNEMOUTH-POOLE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a place of worship for an Orthodox Christian parish. Cares for and raises funds to repair an ecclesiastical building of architectural merit. Rents out the church hall for use by local organisations. Provides a venue for the performance of classical music. Helps to integrate Orthodox Christians from abroad into British society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bournemouth
- Poole
Governance
- 27 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Conor Paul Ambrose | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGHIOS KYPRIANOU | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHARLES LEONARD CHRYSOSTOM MACDONNELL BA PGCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILBERT MEAL DC DOCTOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.21k | £182.69k | £70.25k | £55.55k | £58.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.05k | £42.95k | £122.04k | £42.82k | £61.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 JANUARY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 13 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE OR HERITAGE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (C) THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FORMER ST. OSMUND'S CHURCH BUILDING AS A PLACE OF ARCHITECTURAL AND ARTISTIC MERIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (D) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN IMMIGRANTS AND WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH ASSISTANCE/SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (A) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS; (F) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE. THESE ARE ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2006 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE COMPANY IS A CHARITY, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 COVENTRY CLOSE
CORFE MULLEN
WIMBORNE
BH21 3UP
- Phone:
- 01202602628
- Email:
- fr.chrysostom@gmx.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window