ALWINTON CHURCH SUMMER CONCERTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A season of 4 summer concerts held in Alwinton Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Standard registration
- 14 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1198557 WOOLER ARTS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.40k | £13.27k | £12.85k | £2.45k | £7.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.82k | £12.99k | £13.62k | £2.15k | £8.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 31 December 2019 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 2011 as amended on 18 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC'S KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION IN ALL TYPES OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN TRADITIONAL FOLK, CLASSICAL MUSIC AND ALL PERIODS OF JAZZ MUSIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ANNUAL CONCERTS AT ALWINTON CHURCH AND/OR OTHER VENUES SITUATED IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
ALWINTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window