Financial history WHITE STAR FC

Charity Number: 1139243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £24.27k £37.69k £42.04k £46.81k £105.20k
Total expenditure £26.55k £28.28k £52.45k £49.53k £106.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.28k £23.52k