Financial history NETHER EDGE NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP

Charity Number: 1139239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.28k £14.35k £23.73k £25.57k £36.33k
Total expenditure £29.94k £22.28k £17.28k £25.06k £38.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A £444 N/A £500