NETHER EDGE NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nether Edge Neighbourhood Group organises four Farmer's and Craft Markets annually. A wildflower meadow area has been planted in the local park and bulbs planted in grass verges. We also organise other events such as a Party in The Park a. Our aim is to improve the environment and conditions of life in the area and to encourage residents to participate in the community's activities and affairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
165 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 01 December 2010: Standard registration
- 10 January 2012: Funds received from 502817 NETHER EDGE NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP
- NENG (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Lambert | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Elizabeth Gerson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eric Taylor | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD FRY | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.28k | £14.35k | £23.73k | £25.57k | £36.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.94k | £22.28k | £17.28k | £25.06k | £38.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £444 | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE ESPECIALLY OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE AREAS OF BRINCLIFFE, NETHER EDGE AND SHARROW IN SHEFFIELD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES..
Area of benefit
BRINCLIFFE, NETHER EDGE AND SHARROW IN SHEFFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Thornsett Road
SHEFFIELD
S7 1NB
- Phone:
- 07518118789
- Email:
- ken.lambert227@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window