QWEST FTM UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The term FtM includes those identified as female at birth but who no longer identify as such. We aim to: Promote the social inclusion and equality Provide advice and information Provide educational awareness of thier needs Provide networking and activities to increase awareness Raise public awareness of the issues affecting FtMs Provide workshops, forums, advocacy and general support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 February 2011: Standard registration
- 03 December 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.58k | £12.75k | £13.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.36k | £14.16k | £18.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF TRANSMEN AND GENDER FLUID PEOPLE, AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY; BY 1. PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO TRANSMEN, GENDER FLUID PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES TO MAXIMISE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES TO LIVE SAFELY, COMFORTABLY AND PRODUCTIVELY IN SOCIETY; 2. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF TRANSMEN, GENDER FLUID PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES TO ENCOURAGE SERVICE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT THEIR SERVICES TO MEET THE NEEDS AND THE PUBLIC TO BE MORE ACCEPTING OF AND ENGAGING WITH THIS COMMUNITY; 3. PROVIDING NETWORK GROUPS AND GROUP ACTIVITIES TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR TRANSMEN, GENDER FLUID PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY; 4. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING TRANSMEN, GENDER FLUID PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; 5. PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; 6. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR TRANSMEN, GENDER FLUID PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN SAFE AND INCLUSIVE ENVIRONMENTS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window