BENGALI CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP(UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings held once a month at Lansbury Lodge, Poplar (as connected to Tower Hamlets Community Church) to encourage the faith of Bengali believers and are open to whoever wishes to attend. In addition groups of Bengali believers also meet in each others homes during the month to receive teaching from the Bible, leading to discussion, to pray, share meals together and assist practically.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 2011: Standard registration
- 08 August 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 August 2024: Funds transferred to 285707 TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY CHURCH
- BCF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £2.27k | £1.42k | £1.35k | £1.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £3.12k | £1.36k | £0 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER CHRISTIAN CHURCHES, ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS MAKING AND BAPTISING DISCIPLES AS COMMANDED BY OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) TO OFFER CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TO ALL BENGALI SPEAKING PEOPLE IN THE UK INCLUDING PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO GATHER TOGETHER ON SUNDAYS, AND OTHER DAYS, WEEKLY IN WORSHIP OF ALMIGHTY GOD AND HIS SON OUR SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST. B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND TO MEET OTHER NEEDS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG BENGALI PEOPLE. C) TO CARE FOR AND SEEK HEALING FOR THOSE WHO ARE MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY ILL AND/OR DISABLED. D) TO INITIATE EDUCATION LEADING TO THE SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT, AND TO ORGANISE TRAINING OF, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE, FAITH AND BEHAVIOUR.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window