Accounts and annual returns OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS WITHOUT BORDERS

Charity Number: 1142000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 February 2025 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 December 2023 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 September 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required