UKAJ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AKIM-Jerusalem provides housing for people with intellectual disabilities and other developmental disorders of all ages and functioning. It operates 3 hostels and 17 apartments in the city of Jerusalem, housing close to 170 residents. UKAJ is the UK arm of Akim-Jerusalem
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
R JULIAN BIER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES HERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.40k | £1.26k | £1.50k | £578 | £720 | |
|
Total expenditure | £216 | £216 | £216 | £126 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF AKIM-JERUSALEM (A REGISTERED ISRAELI CHARITY {TAX EXEMPTION NUMBER 58-0001-551-0} WHICH PROVIDES A RANGE OF SERVICES TO PEOPLE WITH MENTAL DISABILITIES) BY RAISING AWARENESS AND FUNDS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 REGENTS PARK ROAD
LONDON
NW1 8BB
- Phone:
- 0207224345
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window