Accounts and annual returns SURF ACTION

Charity Number: 1140191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 28 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 28 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 18 September 2023 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 01 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window