PURBECK ART WEEKS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PAW Festival aims to encourage appreciation of the arts across the Isle of Purbeck, Dorset area by staging a wide range of performances and art exhibitions. It encourages and promotes artists who live or work in Purbeck . We want to encourage younger people, support emerging artists, be adventurous and stimulate as well as inform as wide an audience as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
- PAW FESTIVAL (Working name)
- PURBECK ART WEEKS FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Frances Heath | Chair | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Marsh | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Evans | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Salt | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma-Louise Grinsted | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlotte Ormond | Trustee | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOAN EVELYN INGARFIELD | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.54k | £34.34k | £54.40k | £85.21k | £71.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.55k | £44.85k | £48.79k | £68.96k | £63.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 24 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
PROMOTING MAINTAINING IMPROVING AND ADVANCING EDUCATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND PARTICULARLY IN THE PURBECK DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA BY THE PROMOTION PRODUCTION PERFORMANCE AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DEBATING, DRAMA, DANCE, CINEMATOGRAPHY, COMPUTER GRAPHICS, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE, PAINTING, PHOTOGRAPHY.
Area of benefit
PURBECK DISTRICT COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RED ROOF BARN
COOMBE KEYNES
WAREHAM
DORSET
BH20 5HJ
- Phone:
- 07789203072
- Email:
- info@purbeckartweeks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window