THE PEN ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Al-Qalam Institute provides Cultural & Islamic education and activities mainly during the weekends and evenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
- AL-QALAM INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BASHIR GONI | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/07/2020 | 24/07/2021 | 24/07/2022 | 24/07/2023 | 24/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.23k | £43.87k | £48.44k | £52.67k | £52.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.26k | £44.92k | £52.28k | £58.28k | £54.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 July 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 506 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 506 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 APR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR IN THE SUBJECT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND ITS TRADITIONS WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PEN ACADEMY
66 Barrack Street
COLCHESTER
CO1 2LS
- Phone:
- 07912020383
- Email:
- info@qalamacademy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window