Financial history NORTHBOURNE STREET YOUTH INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1139235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £94.21k £100.26k £194.09k £109.50k £134.25k
Total expenditure £93.29k £86.31k £99.82k £155.03k £161.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £27.00k £32.92k £36.83k