STROKE CARE

Charity number: 1143750
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity shall be to promote, develop and undertake activities, which raise awareness and supports people including families and carers, affected by strokes and other debilitating illness in any manner which is deemed by law to be charitable anywhere in the UK, regardless of colour, disability, ethnicity or religious belief.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016

Total income: £18,794
Total expenditure: £17,494

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Lewisham
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2011: Standard registration
  • 04 April 2012: Funds transferred to 1105820 STROKE CARE, LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND LEWISHAM
  • 04 April 2012: Funds received from 1105820 STROKE CARE, LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND LEWISHAM
  • 29 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SC (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £58.66k £28.52k £61.09k £46.89k £18.79k
Total expenditure £54.70k £24.34k £59.89k £45.47k £17.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £26.00k £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 23 January 2015 On Time