Financial history LGA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £171.30k £1.34m £105.59k £146.63k £1.42m
Total expenditure £207.36k £248.84k £187.91k £343.54k £413.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.24m N/A N/A £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £100.17k N/A N/A £170.75k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £219.45k N/A N/A £383.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £29.39k N/A N/A £30.28k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A £46.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £333.47k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £29.39k N/A N/A £30.28k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0