Accounts and annual returns THE PIPPA JONES LITTLE TREASURE TRUST

Charity number: 1139382
Charity reporting is overdue by 1167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1167 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1167 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required