CALVARY CHAPEL YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH SERVICES: SUN. AM; SUN EVENING. MUMS & TOTS MEET ON WED. MORNINGS; WOMEN MEET FRI. MORNINGS & YOUTH THUR. EVENINGS. WE ORGANISE EVENTS FOR STUDENTS, FAMILIES, SENIOR CITIZENS, WOMEN & MEN. MONTHLY EVENTS FOR PRISONERS IN EVERTHORPE, WOLDS & PRISONS. OUR BIBLE COLLEGE RUNS TWO 15 WEEK RESIDENTIAL SEMESTERS PER YEAR. STUDENTS SERVE IN THE COMMUNITY IN VARIOUS WAYS INCLUDING PRISON VISITING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Bristol City
- Cardiff
- City Of York
- Cumbria
- Devon
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Nottinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Belgium
- China
- Cyprus
- Germany
- Mauritius
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 November 2010: Standard registration
- 07 July 2014: Funds received from 1067047 CALVARY CHAPEL YORK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SCOTT SYLVESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN DONALD BRODERSEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £560.92k | £358.10k | £270.82k | £405.91k | £339.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £424.79k | £292.52k | £482.23k | £415.64k | £451.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £6.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £327.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £126.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £89.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £16 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £18.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £279.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £97.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £47.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calvary Chapel
1 Barbican Road
YORK
YO10 5AA
- Phone:
- 01904410655
- Email:
- church@calvarychapelyork.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window