UPPER ROOM COMMISSION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2. WE DO VOLUNTEER HEALTH AND SOCIAL WORK IN THE COMMUNITY. 3. WE DO COMMUNITY FREE MENTORSHIP AND THERAPEUTIC COUNSELLING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 20 April 2011: Standard registration
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 February 2014: Re-registered
- 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 July 2018: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev BIMBO ADELEYE AJIMATANRAREJE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHINA ATOYEBI | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR MRS KIKELOMO OLUJUMO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAUSTINA AZIIBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.24k | £13.59k | £17.19k | £4.56k | £3.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.78k | £12.64k | £18.53k | £4.74k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2022 | 552 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN LONDON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE UPPEROOM COMMISSION, UK
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Symonds Road
Fulwood
PRESTON
PR2 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07988674681
- Email:
- info@upperroomcommission.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window