THE CONSTITUTION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Constitution Society is an independent, non-aligned educational trust. We promote public understanding of the British Constitution and work to encourage informed debate between legislators, academics and the public about proposals for constitutional change. We do not take any position on the merits of specific reform proposals and have no connection with any political party.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kennon | Chair | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Monaghan | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Walshe | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Euan Henry MacDonald Steedman | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Leolin Alfred Price | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Paddi Salters | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Richard Hickman QC | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Payne | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.43k | £12.75k | £14.48k | £18.05k | £90.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.12k | £108.88k | £168.28k | £164.70k | £158.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.75k | £2.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 May 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 May 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF THE BRITISH CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Constitution Society
Top Floor
61 Petty France
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02072274922
- Email:
- info@constitutionsoc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window