THE CROSS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity running an after-school club once a week primarily aimed at children in primary school between Year 1 and Year 6. We teach English and Mathematics to provide additional support to primary school children with a fun ice breaking activity at the start. This is run solely by volunteers and we fund raise for hiring halls and supplies and snacks for the attendees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 December 2011: Standard registration
- NKCR (Working name)
- NORTHERN KOREAN CHILDREN RELIEF (Working name)
- NORTH KOREAN CHILDREN RELIEF (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MYUNG SOOK KIM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Do Yun Kim | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev JUNG HWAN LEE | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|||||
JONG DO PARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.04k | £7.38k | £8.54k | £7.27k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.75k | £1.02k | £2.14k | £4.32k | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/07/2011 as amended on 18 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AND ORPHANS IN NORTH KOREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS PROVIDING FOOD, MEDICINE, AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF KOREAN YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK (IN PARTICULAR THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON), THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 38
Grafham House
11 St. Johns Road
NEW MALDEN
Surrey
KT3 3FL
- Phone:
- 02037954563
- Email:
- info@nkcr.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window